US SR741 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5987)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5987)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates October 30, 2020, as a national day of remembrance for workers of the nuclear weapons program, including uranium workers.
Title
A resolution designating October 30, 2020, as a national day of remembrance for the workers of the nuclear weapons program of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5987) |
Same As/Similar To
SR377 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/24/2019 CR S6160)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/741/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres741/BILLS-116sres741ats.pdf |