US SR703 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243; text: CR S3242)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243; text: CR S3242)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating June 2022 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month" and June 27, 2022, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day".
Title
A resolution designating June 2022 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month" and June 27, 2022, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Tommy Tuberville [R-AL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-12 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243; text: CR S3242) |
Same As/Similar To
HR506 (Related) 2021-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR1206 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR289 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4908; text: CR 6/24/2021 S4783-4784)
HR1206 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR289 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4908; text: CR 6/24/2021 S4783-4784)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/703/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres703/BILLS-117sres703ats.pdf |