US HR1206 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the month of June 2022 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month" and June 27, 2022, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the month of June 2022 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month" and June 27, 2022, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR506 (Related) 2021-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR289 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4908; text: CR 6/24/2021 S4783-4784)
SR703 (Related) 2022-07-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243; text: CR S3242)
SR289 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4908; text: CR 6/24/2021 S4783-4784)
SR703 (Related) 2022-07-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243; text: CR S3242)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1206/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1206/BILLS-117hres1206ih.pdf |