US SR651 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2755-2756)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2755-2756)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 3, 2022, as "National Gun Violence Awareness Day" and June 2022 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month".
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 3, 2022, as "National Gun Violence Awareness Day" and June 2022 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2755-2756) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1144 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR437 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR242 (Related) 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR437 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR242 (Related) 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/651/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres651/BILLS-117sres651is.pdf |