US SR242 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 4, 2021, as "National Gun Violence Awareness Day" and June 2021 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month".
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 4, 2021, as "National Gun Violence Awareness Day" and June 2021 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR437 (Same As) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR1144 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR651 (Related) 2022-05-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2755-2756)
HR1144 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR651 (Related) 2022-05-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2755-2756)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/242/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres242/BILLS-117sres242is.pdf |