US SR590 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2559; text: CR S2555)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2559; text: CR S2555)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of May 15, 2020, as National Senior Fraud Awareness Day and encourages the development of policies that help prevent scams targeting older adults.
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of May 15, 2020, as "National Senior Fraud Awareness Day" to raise awareness about the increasing number of fraudulent schemes targeting seniors in the United States, to encourage the implementation of policies to prevent those schemes, and to improve protections from those schemes for seniors.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2559; text: CR S2555) |
Same As/Similar To
HR339 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
SR210 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2837; text: CR S2836)
SR210 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2837; text: CR S2836)
Subjects
Aging
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Internet and video services
Postal service
Telephone and wireless communication
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Internet and video services
Postal service
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/590/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres590/BILLS-116sres590ats.pdf |