US SR571 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/12/2020 CR S2382-2383)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/12/2020 CR S2382-2383)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution congratulates the students, families, teachers, administrators, and staff of public charter schools across the United States for (1) making ongoing contributions to public education, (2) making impressive strides in closing the academic achievement gap in U.S. schools, and (3) improving and strengthening the public school system. The resolution supports the ideals and goals of the 21st annual National Charter Schools Week.
Title
A resolution congratulating the students, parents, teachers, and leaders of charter schools across the United States for making ongoing contributions to education and supporting the ideals and goals of the 21st annual National Charter Schools Week, to be held May 10 through May 16, 2020.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/12/2020 CR S2382-2383) |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2559) |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
SR202 (Related) 2019-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2793; text: CR S2792)
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula