US SR505 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2629 S2630-2631; text: CR S2629)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2629 S2630-2631; text: CR S2629)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States. Thanks the teachers of the United States and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to participate in National Teacher Appreciation Week.
Title
A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2629 S2630-2631; text: CR S2629) |
Same As/Similar To
HR312 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR880 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR163 (Same As) 2017-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968)
HR880 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR163 (Same As) 2017-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/505/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres505/BILLS-115sres505ats.pdf |