US HR312 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the roles and contributions of America's teachers to building and enhancing the Nation's civic, cultural, and economic well-being. Thanks and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to participate in National Teacher Appreciation Week.
Title
Recognizing the roles and contributions of America's teachers to building and enhancing the Nation's civic, cultural, and economic well-being.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR163 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968)
HR880 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR505 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2629 S2630-2631; text: CR S2629)
HR880 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR505 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2629 S2630-2631; text: CR S2629)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/312/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres312/BILLS-115hres312ih.pdf |