US SR163 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States. Thanks the teachers of the United States and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to participate in National Teacher Appreciation Week.
Title
A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968) |
Same As/Similar To
HR312 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR880 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR505 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2629 S2630-2631; text: CR S2629)
HR880 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR505 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2629 S2630-2631; text: CR S2629)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres163/BILLS-115sres163ats.pdf |