US SR416 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6993; text: CR S7005)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6993; text: CR S7005)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of October 17 through 23, 2021, as "National Chemistry Week".
Title
A resolution designating the week of October 17 through 23, 2021, as "National Chemistry Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6993; text: CR S7005) |
Same As/Similar To
HR705 (Related) 2021-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SR815 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6052-6053; text: CR S5557-5558)
HR1440 (Related) 2022-10-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SR815 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6052-6053; text: CR S5557-5558)
HR1440 (Related) 2022-10-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/416/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres416/BILLS-117sres416ats.pdf |