US SR395 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80-81; text: CR 10/31/2019 S6340)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80-81; text: CR 10/31/2019 S6340)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the 40th anniversary of the Iran Hostage Crisis. The resolution also honors the suffering of the hostages and sacrifices of those who attempted to rescue them.
Title
A resolution recognizing the 40th anniversary of the Iran Hostage Crisis, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80-81; text: CR 10/31/2019 S6340) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 368. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Terrorism
U.S. history
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Terrorism
U.S. history