US SR373 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1001-1003; text of measure as introduced: CR S1001)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1001-1003; text of measure as introduced: CR S1001)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the historical significance of Executive Order 9066 and expressing the sense of the Senate that policies that discriminate against any individual based on the actual or perceived race, ethnicity, national origin, or religion of that individual would be a repetition of the mistakes of Executive Order 9066 and contrary to the values of the United States. Recognizes the historical significance of: (1) February 19, 1942, as the date on which President Franklin Delano Roosevelt signed Executive Order 9066, which restricted the freedom of Japanese Americans; and (2) February 19, 1976, as the date on which President Gerald Ford issued Presidential Proclamation 4417, which formally terminated such executive order. Expresses support for the goals of the Japanese American community in recognizing a National Day of Remembrance to increase public awareness about the unjust measures taken to restrict the freedom of Japanese Americans during World War II. Expresses the sense that: (1) such Day is an opportunity to reflect on the importance of upholding justice and civil liberties for all people of the United States and to oppose hate, xenophobia, and bigotry; and (2) policies that discriminate against any individual based on the actual or perceived race, ethnicity, national origin, or religion of that individual would be a repetition of the mistakes of Executive Order 9066 and contrary to U.S. values. Recognizes the positive contributions that people of every race, ethnicity, religion, and national origin have made to the United States. Confirms the dedication of the Senate to the rights and dignity of all people of the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the historical significance of Executive Order 9066 and expressing the sense of the Senate that policies that discriminate against any individual based on the actual or perceived race, ethnicity, national origin, or religion of that individual would be a repetition of the mistakes of Executive Order 9066 and contrary to the values of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1001-1003; text of measure as introduced: CR S1001) |
Same As/Similar To
HR626 (Related) 2016-02-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Asia
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Detention of persons
Japan
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Detention of persons
Japan
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/373/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres373/BILLS-114sres373is.pdf |