US SR356 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-21 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S4659-4660)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-21 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S4659-4660)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of September 18 through September 24, 2023, as "Rail Safety Week" in the United States and supporting the goals and ideals of Rail Safety Week to reduce highway-rail grade crossing and trespasser-related incidents, fatalities, and injuries, reduce derailments, improve the safe transportation of hazardous materials by rail, and prevent rail worker fatalities.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of September 18 through September 24, 2023, as "Rail Safety Week" in the United States and supporting the goals and ideals of Rail Safety Week to reduce highway-rail grade crossing and trespasser-related incidents, fatalities, and injuries, reduce derailments, improve the safe transportation of hazardous materials by rail, and prevent rail worker fatalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. J.D. Vance [R-OH] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. John Fetterman [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S4659-4660) |
Same As/Similar To
HR698 (Related) 2023-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR864 (Related) 2024-09-25 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S6451-6452)
SR864 (Related) 2024-09-25 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S6451-6452)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/356/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres356/BILLS-118sres356is.pdf |