US SR35 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - S.Amdt.4920 Amendment SA 4920 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution states that the Senate supports the people of Burma (Myanmar) in their ambition for a genuine democracy, sustainable peace, genuine ethnic reconciliation, and fundamental human rights for all. It also calls on the military junta to release all those detained in the February 1, 2021, military coup, remove restrictions on travel and communications, and return the elected civilian government to power.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution condemning the military coup that took place on February 1, 2021, in Burma and the Tatmadaw's detention of civilian leaders, calling for an immediate and unconditional release of all those detained, promoting accountability and justice for those killed by the Tatmadaw, and calling for those elected to serve in parliament to resume their duties without impediment, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01SenateS.Amdt.4920 Amendment SA 4920 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2022-02-01SenateS.Amdt.4920 Amendment SA 4920 proposed by Senator Menendez for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S451; text: CR S451) To amend the title.
2022-02-01SenateS.Amdt.4919 Amendment SA 4919 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2022-02-01SenateS.Amdt.4919 Amendment SA 4919 proposed by Senator Menendez for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S451; text: CR S451) To amend the preamble.
2022-02-01SenateThe committee substitute amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
2022-02-01SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S451-452)
2022-02-01SenateS.Amdt.4918 Amendment SA 4918 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2022-02-01SenateS.Amdt.4918 Amendment SA 4918 proposed by Senator Menendez for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S450; text: CR S450-451) In the nature of a substitute.
2022-02-01SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
2022-02-01SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S449-451)
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 26.
2021-03-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2021-03-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-02-04SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S487-488)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback