US SR341 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2737; text: 08/07/2021 CR S6012-6013)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2737; text: 08/07/2021 CR S6012-6013)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution commemorating the 70th anniversary of the signing of the Security Treaty among Australia, New Zealand, and the United States of America.
Title
A resolution commemorating the 70th anniversary of the signing of the Security Treaty among Australia, New Zealand, and the United States of America.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2737; text: 08/07/2021 CR S6012-6013) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 375. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HR622 (Same As) 2021-10-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation.