US SR287 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating October 8, 2017, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day". Designates October 8, 2017, as National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day.
Title
A resolution designating October 8, 2017, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368) |
Same As/Similar To
SR664 (Related) 2018-10-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6415; text: CR S6415)
HR1115 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR1115 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Commemorative events and holidays
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Commemorative events and holidays
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/287/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres287/BILLS-115sres287ats.pdf |