US SR664 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6415; text: CR S6415)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6415; text: CR S6415)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating October 8, 2018, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day". Designates October 8, 2018, as National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day.
Title
A resolution designating October 8, 2018, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6415; text: CR S6415) |
Same As/Similar To
SR287 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368)
HR1115 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR1115 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Commemorative events and holidays
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Commemorative events and holidays
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/664/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres664/BILLS-115sres664ats.pdf |