US HR1115 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of October 8, 2018, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of October 8, 2018, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-10-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR287 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368)
SR664 (Related) 2018-10-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6415; text: CR S6415)
SR664 (Related) 2018-10-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6415; text: CR S6415)
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Commemorative events and holidays
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Commemorative events and holidays
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/1115/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres1115/BILLS-115hres1115ih.pdf |