US SR157 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1572; text: 03/30/2023 CR S1107-1108)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1572; text: 03/30/2023 CR S1107-1108)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution commemorating the 25th anniversary of the signing of the Good Friday Agreement, and for other purposes.
Title
A resolution commemorating the 25th anniversary of the signing of the Good Friday Agreement, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1572; text: 03/30/2023 CR S1107-1108) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 43. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |