US SR151 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5766)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5766)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates October 30, 2009, as a national day of remembrance for American nuclear weapons program workers and uranium miners, millers, and haulers. Encourages Americans to support and participate in appropriate ceremonies, programs, and other activities to commemorate such day.
Title
A resolution designates a national day of remembrance on October 30, 2009, for nuclear weapons program workers.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jim Bunning [R-KY] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Edward Kennedy [D-MA] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5766) | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5766) | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5530) |
Same As/Similar To
HR790 (Related) 2009-10-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR653 (Related) 2010-09-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7666-7669; text as passed Senate: CR S7666; text of measure as introduced: CR S7635)
HR1623 (Related) 2010-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR653 (Related) 2010-09-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7666-7669; text as passed Senate: CR S7666; text of measure as introduced: CR S7635)
HR1623 (Related) 2010-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health