US HR1623 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the goals and ideals of a national day of remembrance for U.S. nuclear weapons program workers and uranium miners, millers, and haulers.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of a national day of remembrance for United States nuclear weapons program workers and uranium miners, millers, and haulers.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Zach Wamp [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-15 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HR790 (Related) 2009-10-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR151 (Related) 2009-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5766)
SR653 (Related) 2010-09-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7666-7669; text as passed Senate: CR S7666; text of measure as introduced: CR S7635)
SR151 (Related) 2009-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5766)
SR653 (Related) 2010-09-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7666-7669; text as passed Senate: CR S7666; text of measure as introduced: CR S7635)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Department of Energy
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health
Congressional tributes
Department of Energy
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/1623/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres1623/BILLS-111hres1623ih.pdf |