US SR136 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2589)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2589)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of May 1, 2015, as "Silver Star Service Banner Day". Supports the designation of May 1, 2015, as Silver Star Service Banner Day.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of May 1, 2015, as "Silver Star Service Banner Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2589) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2253) |
Same As/Similar To
SR437 (Related) 2016-04-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2400; text of measure as introduced: CR S2394)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition