US SR135 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of May 1, 2017, as "Silver Star Service Banner Day". Expresses support for the designation of May 1, 2017, as Silver Star Service Banner Day.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of May 1, 2017, as "Silver Star Service Banner Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2653) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2495) |
Same As/Similar To
SB917 (Related) 2017-05-26 - Held at the desk.
SR480 (Related) 2018-04-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2349; text: CR S2349)
SR480 (Related) 2018-04-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2349; text: CR S2349)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition