US SR10 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 1/8/2019 S70)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 1/8/2019 S70)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) extends heartfelt sympathy to the family of Richard Arvin Overton, who was the oldest surviving veteran, on the occasion of his death; and (2) honors his life and his service to the United States.
Title
A resolution honoring the life of Richard Arvin Overton.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 1/8/2019 S70) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S297) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR37 (Related) 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.