US SJR55 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Star Print ordered on the joint resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Star Print ordered on the joint resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Council on Environmental Quality relating to "National Environmental Policy Act Implementing Regulations Revisions".
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Council on Environmental Quality relating to "National Environmental Policy Act Implementing Regulations Revisions".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the joint resolution. |
2022-08-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-08-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 47. Record Vote Number: 283. (consideration: CR S4004-4013; text: CR S4004) |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 468. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged, by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR91 (Same As) 2022-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.