US SJR22 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-21 - Veto message indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S147)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-21 - Veto message indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S147)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Corps of Engineers and the Environmental Protection Agency relating to the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act. This joint resolution nullifies the rule submitted by the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and the Environmental Protection Agency relating to the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Clean Water Act and published on June 29, 2015.
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Corps of Engineers and the Environmental Protection Agency relating to the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-21 - Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.J.Res. 22 (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-13 - House - On Passage (Y: 253 N: 166 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-04 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution S.J.Res. 22 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-30 - Senate - On the Motion to Proceed S.J.Res. 22 (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 239 N: 183 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - On Passage (Y: 253 N: 166 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-04 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution S.J.Res. 22 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-30 - Senate - On the Motion to Proceed S.J.Res. 22 (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 239 N: 183 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | House | Veto message indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S147) |
2016-01-21 | House | Cloture on the veto message not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 40. Record Vote Number: 5. (consideration: CR S146-147; text: CR S146) |
2016-01-21 | House | Veto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S143-147) |
2016-01-20 | House | Cloture motion on the veto message presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S111-112; text: CR S111) |
2016-01-20 | House | Veto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S100, S111-112) |
2016-01-20 | House | Veto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk. |
2016-01-20 | House | Vetoed by President. (text of veto message: CR S129-130) |
2016-01-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-01-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-01-13 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 253 - 166 (Roll no. 45). (text: CR H335) |
2016-01-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H355-356) |
2016-01-13 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S.J.Res. 22, the Chair put the question on passage, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Gibbs demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced. |
2016-01-13 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H346) |
2016-01-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 22. |
2016-01-13 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1644, S.J. Res. 22 and H.R. 3662. The resolution also provides for proceedings during the period from January 14, 2016, through January 22, 2016. |
2016-01-13 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 583. (consideration: CR H335-346) |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 583 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1644, S.J. Res. 22 and H.R. 3662. The resolution also provides for proceedings during the period from January 14, 2016, through January 22, 2016. |
2015-11-16 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-11-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 297. (text: CR S7743) |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S7703-7715, S7735-7743) |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S7703) |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 43. Record Vote Number: 296. |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286. |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). (consideration: CR S7675; text: CR S7675) |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR59 (Same As) 2015-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HR583 (Related) 2016-01-12 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 239 - 183 (Roll no. 37). (text: CR H297)
HR583 (Related) 2016-01-12 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 239 - 183 (Roll no. 37). (text: CR H297)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Army Corps of Engineers
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Water quality
Army Corps of Engineers
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Water quality