US SB959 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 599.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 599.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes in the Smithsonian Institution a comprehensive women's history museum. Such museum shall be named by the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution. The bill establishes a council that, among other things, shall make recommendations to the board on the planning, design, and construction of the museum. The board shall designate a site for the museum, with priority given to a site that is on or near the National Mall.
Title
Smithsonian American Women’s History Museum Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 599. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Blunt with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091-2092) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1980 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
District of Columbia
Executive agency funding and structure
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
U.S. history
Women's employment
Women's rights
District of Columbia
Executive agency funding and structure
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
U.S. history
Women's employment
Women's rights