US HB1980 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 234-60)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 3) establishes in the Smithsonian Institution a comprehensive women's history museum. Such museum shall be named by the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution. (Sec. 4) The bill establishes a council, that, among other things, shall make recommendations to the board on the planning, design, and construction of the museum. (Sec. 7) The board shall designate a site for the museum, with priority given to a site that is on or near the National Mall.
Title
Smithsonian Women's History Museum Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 59 (Y: 374 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2020-02-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 37 (Roll no. 59). (text: CR H1029-1031) |
2020-02-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1037) |
2020-02-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-02-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1980. |
2020-02-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1029-1035) |
2020-02-11 | House | Ms. Lofgren moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 230. |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2019-11-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 116-286, Part I. |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-11-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-11 | House | Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B.. |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB959 (Related) 2020-12-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 599.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
District of Columbia
Executive agency funding and structure
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
U.S. history
Women's employment
Women's rights
District of Columbia
Executive agency funding and structure
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
U.S. history
Women's employment
Women's rights