US SB938 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Procurement Fraud Prevention Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the General Services Administration to establish procedures to ensure that any notice regarding registration of a small business concern in a procurement system contains information about cost-free federal procurement technical assistance services that are available through the Small Business Administration, Procurement Technical Assistance Centers of the Defense Logistics Agency, the Department of Commerce, and other federal agencies and programs.
Title
Procurement Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-166. |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2720 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Business education
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Small business