US SB817 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes silencers from the definition of firearms for purposes of the National Firearms Act. It also treats persons acquiring or possessing a firearm silencer as meeting any registration and licensing requirements of such Act. The Department of Justice must destroy certain records relating to the registration, transfer, or making of a silencer. The bill also revises the definition of firearm silencer and firearm muffler under the federal criminal code and includes such items in the 10% excise tax category.
Title
Hearing Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB155 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB775 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB202 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB775 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB202 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Federal preemption
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Licensing and registrations
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Taxation
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Licensing and registrations
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/817/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s817/BILLS-116s817is.pdf |