US SB202 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the treatment of silencers under federal statutes governing the sale, transfer, and possession of firearms. Specifically, it removes silencers from the list of firearms subject to regulation (i.e., registration and licensing requirements) under the National Firearms Act (NFA). Additionally, it excludes a muffler or silencer from the list of firearms subject to regulation (e.g., background check requirements) under the Gun Control Act of 1968 (GCA). Finally, the bill does the following: preempts state or local laws that tax or regulate firearm silencers, specifies that a person who lawfully acquires or possesses a silencer under provisions of the GCA meets the registration and licensing requirements of the NFA, eliminates mandatory minimum prison terms for a crime of violence or drug trafficking offense in which a defendant uses or carries a firearm equipped with a silencer or muffler, and permits active and retired law enforcement officers to carry a concealed silencer.
Title
SHUSH Act Silencers Help Us Save Hearing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB775 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB155 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB817 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB155 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB817 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Federal preemption
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Federal preemption
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/202/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s202/BILLS-116s202is.pdf |