US SB811 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the Taiwan Fellowship Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Taiwan Fellowship Act
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3084 (Related) 2021-05-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation.
HB3524 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486.
SB4428 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
HB9010 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
HB3524 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486.
SB4428 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
HB9010 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/811/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s811/BILLS-117s811is.pdf |