US HB3524 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To revitalize and reassert United States leadership, investment, and engagement in the Indo-Pacific region and globally.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EAGLE Act Ensuring American Global Leadership and Engagement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-15HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 22.
2021-07-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-07-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-07-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-06-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2887 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
HB2774 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
HB3084 (Related) 2021-05-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation.
HB3433 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB402 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB1155 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1934 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB3696 (Related) 2021-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB158 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB811 (Related) 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR130 (Related) 2021-04-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4276 (Related) 2021-06-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Africa
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Air quality
Alliances
Alternative and renewable resources
Arctic and polar regions
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Australia
Business ethics
Canada
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Chile
China
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Community life and organization
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Denmark
Department of State
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Ecology
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental health
Environmental technology
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Fiji
Financial services and investments
Finland
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign labor
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Forests, forestry, trees
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Free trade and trade barriers
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hong Kong
Human rights
Iceland
Immigration status and procedures
Immunology and vaccination
India
Indonesia
Industrial policy and productivity
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Iran
Japan
Judicial procedure and administration
Kiribati
Land use and conservation
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Malaysia
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marshall Islands
Mexico
Micronesia
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
Mining
Multilateral development programs
National and community service
Natural disasters
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New Zealand
News media and reporting
Norway
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Oil and gas
Pacific Ocean
Pakistan
Palau
Papua New Guinea
Peace Corps
Philippines
Protest and dissent
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Securities
Singapore
Smuggling and trafficking
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Spacecraft and satellites
Sweden
Taiwan
Telephone and wireless communication
Thailand
Tibet
Tonga
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
Turkey
Tuvalu
U.S. and foreign investments
United Kingdom
United Nations
Vanuatu
Vietnam
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
World health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback