US SB784 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2360)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2360)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing a Government Shutdown Act - Provides for automatic continuing appropriations if a regular appropriation bill for a fiscal year (or if applicable, for each fiscal year in a biennium) does not become law or a joint resolution making continuing appropriations is not in effect.
Title
Preventing a Government Shutdown Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2360) |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2336-2337) |
Same As/Similar To
HB339 (Related) 2011-01-19 - Referred to House Rules
HB2319 (Related) 2011-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
SB1679 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
HB3583 (Related) 2011-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
SB3434 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB2319 (Related) 2011-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
SB1679 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
HB3583 (Related) 2011-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
SB3434 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/784/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s784/BILLS-112s784is.pdf |