US SB3434 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
End Government Shutdowns Act - Makes specified provisional (automatic) continuing appropriations in the event that any regular appropriation bill for a fiscal year is not enacted before the beginning of such fiscal year, or a joint resolution making continuing appropriations is not in effect. (Thus prevents a federal government shutdown.)
Title
End Government Shutdowns Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
Sen. Daniel Coats [R-IN] | Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3583 (Related) 2011-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB339 (Related) 2011-01-19 - Referred to House Rules
HB2319 (Related) 2011-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
SB439 (Related) 2011-03-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1525-1527)
SB784 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2360)
SB1679 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
HB339 (Related) 2011-01-19 - Referred to House Rules
HB2319 (Related) 2011-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
SB439 (Related) 2011-03-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1525-1527)
SB784 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2360)
SB1679 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/3434/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s3434/BILLS-112s3434is.pdf |