US HB339 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-19 - Referred to House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-19 - Referred to House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
End the Lame Duck Act - Considers the House of Representatives to be adjourned sine die if it stands adjourned on the date of the regularly scheduled general election for federal office during a Congress (beginning with the 112th Congress) pursuant to a concurrent resolution providing for the adjournment of the House. Authorizes the Speaker of the House and the Majority Leader of the Senate, or their respective designees, acting jointly and with the written agreement of the Minority Leaders of both chambers, to notify the Members of the House and Senate to reassemble if each determines that it is in the interest of the United States to do so. Provides for automatic continuing appropriations if a regular appropriation bill for a fiscal year does not become law before the date of the regularly scheduled general election for federal office held during such fiscal year.
Title
End the Lame Duck Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Judy Biggert [R-IL] | Rep. Brian Bilbray [R-CA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. John Sullivan [R-OK] | Rep. Allen West [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB784 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2360)
HB2319 (Related) 2011-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
SB1679 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
HB3583 (Related) 2011-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
SB3434 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB2319 (Related) 2011-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
SB1679 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
HB3583 (Related) 2011-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
SB3434 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congress
Congressional elections
Congressional operations and organization
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Congress
Congressional elections
Congressional operations and organization
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/339/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr339/BILLS-112hr339ih.pdf |