US SB731 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the management of information technology projects and investments of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Information Technology Reform Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2250 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/731/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s731/BILLS-117s731is.pdf |