US HB2250 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the management of information technology projects and investments of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Information Technology Reform Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] |
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-17 - House - Final Passage Under Suspension of the Rules Results (Y: 414 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 2, 1 Present (Roll no. 484). (text: 11/14/2022 CR H8467-8468) |
2022-11-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8575-8576) |
2022-11-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2250. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8467-8469) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 374. |
2022-09-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 117-492. |
2021-11-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-04 | House | Subcommittee on Technology Modernization Discharged. |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology Modernization. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB731 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB2250 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate.
HB2250 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate.