US SB611 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-119.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-119.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sandia Pueblo Settlement Technical Amendment Act - Amends the T'uf Shur Bien Preservation Trust Area Act to require the Secretary of Agriculture (Secretary), at the request of the Sandia Pueblo of New Mexico and the Secretary of the Interior, to transfer certain National Forest land to the Secretary of the Interior to be held in trust for the Pueblo, if a land exchange with the Pueblo required by that Act is not completed within 30 days of this Act's enactment. Requires such National Forest land to remain undeveloped in its natural state. Directs the Secretary of the Interior, with the consent of the Pueblo and after the transfer of the National Forest land is complete, to: (1) transfer to the Secretary the Pueblo's La Luz tract and a conservation easement on its Piedra Lisa tract, and (2) grant to the Secretary a right-of-way for the Piedra Lisa Trail within the Piedra Lisa tract.
Title
Sandia Pueblo Settlement Technical Amendment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-119. |
2014-06-09 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-06-03 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-05-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4860) |
2014-05-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 611. |
2014-05-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4860-4861) |
2014-05-28 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-03-13 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-03-13 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1595; text as passed Senate: CR S1595) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-136. |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-113. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3605 (Related) 2014-04-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 295.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
New Mexico
Forests, forestry, trees
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
New Mexico