US SB580 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 128.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 128.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces provisions governing the compensation provided to a former President. Each former President shall receive from the United States (1) an annuity of $200,000 per year for the remainder of his or her life, and (2) a monetary allowance of $200,000 per year. Such allowance shall be reduced by the amount the former President's earned income exceeds $400,000. These monetary amounts are subject to a cost-of-living increase. The bill increases and provides for cost-of-living adjustments to the monetary allowance for surviving spouses of former Presidents.
Title
Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 128. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-53. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1496 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents