US HB1496 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2019 This bill revises the compensation provided to a President who leaves office after enactment of this bill or such a President's widow or widower. Each such President, excluding a President removed from office through impeachment, shall receive (1) an annuity of $200,000 per year for the remainder of the President's life, and (2) a monetary allowance of $200,000 per year. Such allowance shall be reduced by the amount the President's earned income exceeds $400,000. These monetary amounts are subject to a cost-of-living increase. The widow or widower of each such President shall be entitled to receive $100,000 per year, payable monthly, if such individual waives the right to each other annuity or pension to which the individual is entitled. This amount is subject to a cost-of-living increase.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-10-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8167-8168)
2019-10-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1496.
2019-10-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8167-8169)
2019-10-16HouseMr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-03-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB580 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 128.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback