US SB569 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-428.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Land and Water Conservation Authorization and Funding Act This bill amends the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 to make permanent the authorization for the Land and Water Conservation Fund (LWCF). Funds deposited into the LWCF may be spent without being subject to the appropriations process. These funds are in addition to amounts made available by the Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006 or otherwise appropriated from the LWCF. The President shall submit to Congress specified details regarding the allocation of funds provided by this bill. Congress may provide for alternate allocations using specified procedures. At least 1.5% of the annual authorized funds shall be used for projects that secure recreational public access to existing federal public land for hunting, fishing, and other recreational purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land and Water Conservation Authorization and Funding Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-11SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-428.
2018-12-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 709.
2018-12-04SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-10-02SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2017-03-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB6759 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback