US SB55 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to limit the detailing of directors of medical centers of the Department of Veterans Affairs to different positions within the Department, and for other purposes.
Title
VACANT Act VA medical Center Absence and Notification Timeline Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
HB693 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
SB2745 (Related) 2023-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB8371 (Related) 2024-11-19 - Received in the Senate.
HB693 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
SB2745 (Related) 2023-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB8371 (Related) 2024-11-19 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/55/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s55/BILLS-118s55is.pdf |