US SB10 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve the workforce of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Clinician Appreciation, Recruitment, Education, Expansion, and Retention Support (CAREERS) Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB55 (Related) 2023-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB693 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB693 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/10/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s10/BILLS-118s10is.pdf |