US SB4897 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to make reforms at institutions of higher education.
Title
Student Loan Reform Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4007 (Related) 2021-06-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB1547 (Related) 2021-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3026 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1547 (Related) 2021-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3026 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/4897/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s4897/BILLS-117s4897is.pdf |