US SB457 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-16-2)
Status: Passed on January 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-112. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-16-2)
Status: Passed on January 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-112. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the issuance of $1 coins bearing the image of President George H.W. Bush for a one-year period beginning on January 1, 2020, and bullion coins bearing the image of First Spouse Barbara Bush during that same period.
Title
President George H.W. Bush and First Spouse Barbara Bush Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-112. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-01-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H198) |
2020-01-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 457. |
2020-01-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H198-201) |
2020-01-13 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1257 Amendment SA 1257 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1257 Amendment SA 1257 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S7058; text: CR S7058) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7058) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1173 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB457 (Related) 2020-01-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-112. (TXT | PDF)
SB457 (Related) 2020-01-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-112. (TXT | PDF)