US SB4461 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1-1)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for a period of continuing appropriations in the event of a lapse in appropriations under the normal appropriations process, and establish procedures and consequences in the event of a failure to enact appropriations.
Title
Prevent Government Shutdowns Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 506. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
SB589 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB3009 (Related) 2019-12-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 321.
SB3009 (Related) 2019-12-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 321.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4461/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4461/BILLS-116s4461pcs.pdf |