US SB3963 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Development, Relief, and Education for Alien Minors Act of 2010 or DREAM Act of 2010 - Authorizes the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to cancel the removal of, and adjust to conditional permanent resident status, an alien who: (1) entered the United States before his or her 16th birthday and has been present in the United States for at least five years immediately preceding this Act's enactment; (2) is a person of good moral character; (3) is not inadmissible or deportable under specified grounds of the Immigration and Nationality Act; (4) has been admitted to an institution of higher education (IHE) or has earned a high school or equivalent diploma; (5) from the age of 16 and older, has never been under a final order of exclusion, deportation, or removal; and (6) was under age 30 on the date of this Act's enactment. Requires aliens to apply for such adjustment of status within one year of being admitted to an IHE or earning a high school or equivalent diploma. Sets forth conditions for maintaining such status and having its conditional basis removed. Authorizes: (1) the Secretary to adjust the status of an alien who has met such conditions prior to enactment of this Act to conditional permanent resident status; and (2) such alien to petition the Secretary for permanent resident status at the end of the conditional residence period. Provides for: (1) exclusive jurisdiction; (2) penalties for false application statements; (3) confidentiality; (4) higher education assistance; and (5) a Government Accountability Office (GAO) report respecting the number of aliens adjusted under this Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Development, Relief, and Education for Alien Minors Act of 2010

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-11-18 Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 645.
2010-11-17 Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7976-7978)

Same As/Similar To

HB1751 (Related) 2009-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
HB6327 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
SB729 (Related) 2009-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3930-3932)
SB3827 (Related) 2010-09-23 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583.
SB3962 (Related) 2010-11-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 644.
SB3992 (Related) 2010-12-09 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the bill rendered moot in Senate. (consideration: CR S8668)
HB6497 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback