US SB3906 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve certain programs of the Small Business Administration to better assist small business customers in accessing broadband technology, and for other purposes.
Title
Small Business Broadband and Emerging Information Technology Enhancement Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-29 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-09-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5167) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | S.Amdt.6027 Amendment SA 6027 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S5167-5168; text: CR S5167) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | S.Amdt.6027 Amendment SA 6027 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | The committee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5166-5168) |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 395. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Cardin with amendments. Without written report. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |